Italiano, Marc Amelio (CPSO#: 70362)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
100 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y9
Phone: (705) 326-3529
Fax: (705) 326-8802
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Orillia Soldiers' Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (705) 325-2201
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC AMELIO ITALIANO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ITALIANO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998