Ito, Joji (CPSO#: 111275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 12 Mar 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saga Ikadaigaku, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOJI ITO may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. ITO is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. ITO shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ITO is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ITO shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ITO ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. ITO ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 11 Mar 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018