Ito, Shinya (CPSO#: 63070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Academic Practice as of 16 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:JICHI Ikadaigaku, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Clinical Pharmacology
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7413
Fax: (416) 813-7562
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Japan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Holland Bloorview Kids Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHINYA ITO may practise medicine only in a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the DIVISION OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, DEPARTMENT OF PAEDIATRICS, UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO in which Dr. ITO holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment at the rank of full or associate professor;

(2) Dr. ITO may practise medicine only to the extent required by the teaching or research requirements of the appointment referred to in clause (1);

(3) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. ITO no longer holds certification by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family Physicians of Canada,

(ii) When Dr. ITO no longer holds a geographical full-time teaching or research appointment to the academic staff of an accredited medical school in Ontario at the rank of full or associate professor,

(iii) When Dr. ITO no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

NOTE: The expiry date of this certificate is as explained above.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 15 May 1995
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 May 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1998