Itoh, Akinobu (CPSO#: 89924)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tohoku Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2008 to 26 Nov 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 27 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012