Ivantchev, Sergei (CPSO#: 87435)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian, Russian

Education:N.Testemitanu State Medical and Pharma, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper River Valley Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
11300 Route 130
Waterville NB  E7P 0A4
Phone: (506) 375-5900
Fax: (506) 375-2772

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SERGEI IVANTCHEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANTCHEV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2009