Ivanyi, Katalin Eva (CPSO#: 63716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-7757
Fax: (905) 575-7831
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Ivanyi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ivanyi ( CPSO# 63716 )

Business Address:
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-7757

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATALIN EVA IVANYI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANYI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Sep 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 1992