Iverson, Gregory Charles (CPSO#: 30292)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 13-1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 10 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017