Ives, Michael Samuel (CPSO#: 55661)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1987

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 River Street
Box 489
Coldwater ON  L0K 1E0
Phone: (705) 686-3335
Fax: (705) 686-3837
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL SAMUEL IVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1987
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 16 May 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 16 Sep 2002

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 Apr 2002
Summary:

 On April 2, 2002, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Michael Samuel Ives guilty of professional 
 misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that 
 having regard to all the circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. Ives be 
 reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register;

2.	The Registrar suspend 
 Dr. Ives( certificate of registration for a period of nine (9) months, five (5) months of which 
 will be suspended if Dr. Ives successfully completes the College(s next available boundaries 
 course.  The suspension will commence on a date to be set by the Registrar of the College, which 
 date shall be no earlier than May 15, 2002;

3.	Dr. Ives will pay costs to the College in the 
 amount of $2,500.00 by April 30, 2002; and

4.	By May 1, 2002, Dr. Ives either will post an 
 irrevocable letter of credit for a period of 5 years in the amount of $10,000.00 to guarantee the 
 payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling 
 for the patient pursuant to s.85.7 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, or deliver a waiver 
 confirming that therapy and counselling will not be sought.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 02, 2002

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: June 24, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a “caution-in-person” is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)