Iwanchyshyn, George John (CPSO#: 62199)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 106
245 Dixon Road
Toronto ON  M9P 2M4
Phone: (416) 249-0009
Fax: (416) 249-8380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iwanchyshyn-De Groot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. W. De Groot ( CPSO# 62177 )
Dr. G. Iwanchyshyn ( CPSO# 62199 )

Business Address:
106 - 245 Dixon Road
Toronto ON  M9P 2M4
Phone Number: (416) 246-0009

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE JOHN IWANCHYSHYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IWANCHYSHYN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991