Iwanochko, Robert Mark (CPSO#: 58126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
E W 5 423
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5236
Fax: (416) 603-5680
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Canada
Phone: (416) 690-9437
Fax: (416) 690-9441
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iwanochko Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Iwanochko ( CPSO# 58126 )

Business Address:
EW5-423
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5236

Business Address:
Suite 8
2575 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L5
Phone Number: (416) 690-9437

Business Address:
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3C 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 753-9581

Business Address:
Suite 304
216 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 428-1243

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK IWANOCHKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IWANOCHKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988