Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Iwasa, Carolyn Takako (CPSO#: 55469)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Guildwood Parkway
Unit 5
Scarborough ON  M1E 4V2
Phone: (416) 269-5088
Fax: (416) 261-3112
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Iwasa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Iwasa ( CPSO# 55469 )

Business Address:
123 Guildwood Parkway
Unit 5
Scarborough ON  M1E 4V2
Phone Number: (416) 269-5090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLYN TAKAKO IWASA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IWASA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1986