Iwata, Yusuke (CPSO#: 111416)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jan 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 05 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Hamamatsu Medical University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Centre for Addiction
And Mental Health
Department of Psychiatry
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YUSUKE IWATA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. IWATA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. IWATA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. IWATA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. IWATA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. IWATA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. IWATA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2017 to 04 Apr 2017
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018