Izard, Jason Patrick (CPSO#: 84919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
Department of Urology - Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-2493
Fax: (613) 545-1970
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jason Izard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Izard ( CPSO# 84919 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Urology
76 Stuart Street
Empire 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2493

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON PATRICK IZARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2013