Izenberg, Aaron Efrem (CPSO#: 86186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
M1-600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4475
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aaron Izenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Izenberg ( CPSO# 86186 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1-600
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4475

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON EFREM IZENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2013