Izukawa, Dennis Mark Sakuo (CPSO#: 52621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Queensway West
Suite 210
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 566-9750
Fax: (905) 566-9717
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dennis Izukawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Izukawa ( CPSO# 52621 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 566-9750

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS MARK SAKUO IZUKAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZUKAWA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1988