Izukawa, Terumi Anne (CPSO#: 55806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3560 Bathurst Street
Room 1c13
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Phone: (416) 785-2500 Ext. 2621
Fax: (416) 785-2863
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Terumi A. Izukawa Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Izukawa ( CPSO# 55806 )

Business Address:
Unit 1C13
3560 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERUMI ANNE IZUKAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IZUKAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987