First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 May 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Aug 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Oct 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2010 |