Harrold, JoAnn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71468)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern
Ontario
Department of Neonatology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2415
Fax: (613) 738-4847
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Harrold Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Harrold ( CPSO# 71468 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8561

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOANN ELIZABETH HARROLD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARROLD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001