Jaakkimainen, Ritva Liisa (CPSO#: 69631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family & Community Medicine
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue, Suite A103
North York ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4936
Fax: (416) 480-6038
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Sep 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITVA LIISA JAAKKIMAINEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAAKKIMAINEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Sep 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Sep 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1997