Jabbari, Farhang (CPSO#: 54636)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Turkish

Education:Istanbul University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Wilson Medical Center 130 Wilson Street Hamilton, ON L8R 1E2 905-526-6250
Date Received: 14 Nov 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2014