Jabi, Maha (CPSO#: 42403)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1984

Summary

Former Name: Al-Jabi, Maha (used until: 24 Feb 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Gamma-Dynacare Medical Laboratories
750 Peter Morand Crescent
Ottawa,On
Canada
Ottawa ON  K1G 6S4
Phone: (613) 729-0200
Fax: (613) 729-1127
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 21 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHA JABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1984