Jablonski, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 55121)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Gdansk, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Apr 2012