Jabs, Corrine Fay Irene (CPSO#: 73319)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
#405
2631 - 28th Avenue
Regina SK  S4S 6X3
Phone: 306 586 3120
Fax: 306 586 3128

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CORRINE FAY IRENE JABS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JABS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2015