Jacka, Michael John (CPSO#: 59920)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002