Jackiewicz, Grazyna Beata (CPSO#: 60305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Sep 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stamford Medical Centre
4256 Portage Road
Suite 306
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone: (905) 374-0781
Fax: (905) 374-6265
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Niagara Children's Centre
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Canada
Phone: (905) 688-3550
Fax: (905) 688-1055
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. & G. Jackiewicz, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jackiewicz ( CPSO# 51975 )
Dr. G. Jackiewicz ( CPSO# 60305 )

Business Address:
Stamford Medical Centre
4256 Portage Road
Suite 306
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6A4
Phone Number: (905) 374-0781

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAZYNA BEATA JACKIEWICZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKIEWICZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1988