Jackson, Aaron Lindsay (CPSO#: 81107)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone: (613) 686-3378
Fax: (613) 225-9736
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jackson ( CPSO# 81107 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Fertility Centre
955 Green Valley Crescent
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K2C 3V4
Phone Number: (613) 686-3378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON LINDSAY JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009