Jackson, Alan Clayton (CPSO#: 50841)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences Centre
GF-543
820 Sherbrook Street
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 787-1578
Fax: (204) 787-1486

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN CLAYTON JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1987