Jackson, Bernard Stanley (CPSO#: 32358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Charlton Avenue East
Suite 810
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 528-0109
Fax: (905) 528-7176
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Stanley Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jackson ( CPSO# 32358 )

Business Address:
Suite 810
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 528-0709

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD STANLEY JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1981