Jackson, Bethany Jodeen (CPSO#: 77701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carleton University Student Health
1125 Colonel By Drive
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 520-6674
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sexual Health Centre
179 Clarence Street
Ottawa ON  K1N 5P7
Canada
Phone: (613) 560-6099
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BETHANY JODEEN JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2005