Jackson, Martin Ramsay (CPSO#: 24246)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2010

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010