Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jackson, Paul Arthur (CPSO#: 59379)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department Of Anaesthesia
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33853
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul A. Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Lennard ( CPSO# 55341 )
Dr. P. Jackson ( CPSO# 59379 )

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
2757 King Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 5E4
Phone Number: (905) 573-7777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ARTHUR JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1989