Jackson, Timothy David (CPSO#: 79080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of General Surgery
8MP Room 322
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5599
Fax: (416) 603-6458
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Timothy Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Jackson ( CPSO# 79080 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Division of General Surgery
Suite 8-322
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5224

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY DAVID JACKSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2009