Jackson-Hughes, Jennie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 82611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Algonquin College Student Health
1385 Woodroffe Ave
Nepean, Ontario
K2G1V8
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B8
Phone: 613-727-4723 Ext. 7222
Fax: (613) 727-3166
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIE ELIZABETH JACKSON-HUGHES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKSON-HUGHES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2007