Jackson-Willms, Mary Louise (CPSO#: 51921)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: Jackson, Mary Louise (used until: 21 Feb 1989 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2006