Jacob, Moire Susan (CPSO#: 26097)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Tamil, Urdu

Education:University of Madras, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients records are available at the clinics where the patients were seen. Patients of Queensway Medical Centre at 880 The Queensway, Toronto, who did not collect their records at the time of closure please contact:: The Rathburn Healthplex Medical Clinic, 452 Rathburn Road, Unit 2, Etobicoke, ON M9C 3S8 Telephone: 416-621-2323 or email Dr. Jacob at moire_jacob@hotmail.com
Date Received: 29 Nov 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2013

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 31, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Moire Susan Jacob, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”).

(1) I, Dr. Jacob, certificate of registration number 26097, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(2) I, Dr. Jacob, acknowledge that I am the subject of an investigation by the College regarding my care and conduct (the “Investigation”). There has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.

(3) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby resign from the College effective March 31, 2013 (the “Effective Date”).

(4) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby acknowledge that I am winding down my practice and undertake that between the date upon which I execute this Undertaking and the Effective Date, I shall see only existing patients. For greater clarity, I shall not accept any new referrals or assess or treat any patient whom I have not seen previously between the date upon which I execute this Undertaking and the Effective Date.

(5) I, Dr. Jacob, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.