Jacob, Sheila Venkatarangam (CPSO#: 58140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: Venkatarangam, Sheila Hannah Malini (used until: 25 Jul 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Sleep Centre
227 Victoria Street
Lower Level 2
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 703-0505
Fax: (416) 703-0507
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA VENKATARANGAM JACOB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOB is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988