Jacobi, Nicole (CPSO#: 97530)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Johannes Gutenberg University at Mainz, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Minnesota

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 29 May 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 Mar 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017