Jacobs, Irving Gene (CPSO#: 52707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Radiology
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6182
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Radiology
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-8800
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Jacobs Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Jacobs ( CPSO# 52707 )

Business Address:
103 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 494-9257

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6186

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRVING GENE JACOBS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989