Jacobson, Kevan (CPSO#: 61577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
BC Children's Hospital
Department of Gastroenterology
4480 Oak Street
Room K4184
Vancouver BC  V6H 3V4
Phone: (604) 875-2332
Fax: (604) 875-3244

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 15 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVAN JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1991