Jacobson, Sheila Jocelyn (CPSO#: 61664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Mar 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Mar 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1466 Bathurst Street
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 531-3331
Fax: (416) 531-1639
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jacobson ( CPSO# 61664 )

Business Address:
201 - 1466 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone Number: (416) 531-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA JOCELYN JACOBSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACOBSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 1992