Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jacobson, Stephen Arnold (CPSO#: 23313)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 21 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 2007