Jacques, Ian Ross (CPSO#: 30754)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: North Bay Regional Health Centre 50 College Drive North Bay, ON P1B 5A4
Date Received: 04 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 1977 to 17 Oct 1978
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1979 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015