Jadot, Sabina Felicitas Carolina (CPSO#: 59832)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Dec 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Canadian Forces Health
Services Centre
C F B Kingston
PO Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone: (613) 541-5010 Ext. 5776
Fax: (613) 541-4465
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brockville General Hospital
PO Box 1050
Brockville ON  K6V 5W7
Canada
Phone: (613) 345-5645
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sabina Jadot Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jadot ( CPSO# 59832 )

Business Address:
Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
CFB Kingston 33CF
PO Box 17000 Station Forces
Kingston ON  K7K 7B4
Phone Number: (613) 541-5010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SABINA FELICITAS CAROLINA JADOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JADOT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1989