Jaffer, Kassamali Mohamed Fazel (CPSO#: 28127)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Mar 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Austin Dr
Brampton ON  L6W 4K4
Phone: (416) 786-9314
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kassamali Jaffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jaffer ( CPSO# 28127 )

Business Address:
21 Austin Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 4K4
Phone Number: (416) 786-9314

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS - Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 Regis Cres S North York ON M3J 1Y6 (416) - 398 - 0638
Date Received: 09 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 13 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 09 Mar 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from March 9, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Kassamali Mohamed
            Fazel Jaffer, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Jaffer
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking") 
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. KASSAMALI MOHAMED FAZEL JAFFER
                                          ("Dr. Jaffer") 
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Jaffer, certificate of registration number 28127, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 106410 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my obstetrics and
                  gynecology practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that I currently hold courtesy privileges only
                  at William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital ("William Osler
                  Hospital Brampton").

            (5)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that I do not practise or have privileges,
                  including courtesy privileges, at any practice location, including but
                  not limited to, any hospitals, clinics and offices, in any jurisdiction,
                  other than William Osler Hospital Brampton (my "Practice Location").

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (6)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately ("Effective Date").


            (7)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that I shall not engage in the practice of
                        medicine as the Most Responsible Physician for any patient(s)
                        whatsoever.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that the entirety of my scope of practice
                        will be limited in the following ways:
                  
                        (i)   I shall only practise medicine as a surgical assistant of a
                              surgeon:
                  
                              a.    certified by the Royal College of Physicians and
                                    Surgeons or recognized as a surgical specialist by the
                                    College; and
                  
                              b.    who holds privileges at William Osler Hospital
                                    Brampton, or other Practice Location as may be approved
                                    by the College,
                  
                              (collectively, a "Qualified Surgeon"); and
                  
                        (ii)  for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                              section (8)(b)(i) above:
                  
                              a.    I will not provide any pre-operative or post-operative
                                    care whatsoever; and
                  
                              b.    a Qualified Surgeon must always be physically in
                                    attendance when I am engaging in my practice as a
                                    surgical assistant.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that I will not engage in any practice of
                        medicine that is not expressly and specifically listed in section
                        (8)(b) above.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that I will not seek to vary this
                        Undertaking at any time to be the Most Responsible Physician in any
                        circumstance.
                  
            (8)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that I will not commence surgical assisting at
                  any other Practice Location (other than William Osler Hospital Brampton)
                  without prior approval of the College. Should I seek privileges to
                  perform surgical assisting at any other Practice Location (other than
                  William Osler Hospital Brampton), I shall advise the College within five
                  (5) days of making such application, and shall seek approval to practice
                  surgical assisting at the Practice Location at least fourteen (14) days
                  before I plan to commence surgical assisting at that location.

            (9)   Compliance and Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jaffer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form, attached hereto as Appendix "A".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Jaffer, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and/or
                        patient charts  by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Qualified Surgeon and any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with
                  similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (15)  I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions,  and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Jaffer, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                                    A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                                    Jaffer engaged in professional misconduct and/or was
                                    incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and
                                    gynecology. As a result of the investigation, Dr.
                                    Jaffer may only practise as a surgical assistant under
                                    the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr.
                                    Jaffer may only practice at William Osler  Health
                                    Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Jaffer, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Qualified Surgeons and all Chiefs of Staff with any of the following:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Jaffer, give my irrevocable consent to all Qualified Surgeons and
                  all Chiefs of Staff to disclose to the College, and to one another, all
                  information relevant to this Undertaking and/or relevant for the purposes
                  of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 9, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kassamali Mohamed Fazel Jaffer to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 9, 2018:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Jaffer engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in the practice of obstetrics and gynecology. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Jaffer may only practise as a surgical assistant under the direction of a qualified surgeon. Further, Dr. Jaffer may only practice at William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital.