Jaffer, Zahra Nasir (CPSO#: 99542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: (705) 658-4544
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Zahra Jaffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Jaffer ( CPSO# 99542 )

Business Address:
19 Hospital Drive
Box 664
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Oct 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAHRA NASIR JAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2012 to 20 Jan 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 29 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2014