Jafferjee, Juzar Hashim (CPSO#: 89733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 May 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 May 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Swahili

Education:Jawaharlal Nehru Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone: (519) 843-4380
Fax: (519) 843-3211
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

801 St.David Street North
Fergus ON  N1M 2L1
Canada
Phone: (519) 787-2940
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

215 ELIZA STREET
Arthur ON  N0G 1A0
Canada
Phone: (519) 848-3795
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jafferjee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jafferjee ( CPSO# 89733 )

Business Address:
753 Tower Street South
Fergus ON  N1M 2R2
Phone Number: (519) 843-3947

Business Address:
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2010

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUZAR HASHIM JAFFERJEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFFERJEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2010 to 31 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 May 2011