Jafrudy, Russell Hooman (CPSO#: 82079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2006

Summary

Former Name: Jafroodifar, Hooman (used until: 05 Feb 2006 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-688 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone: (416) 462-1777
Fax: (416) 462-1775
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Russell Jafrudy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jafrudy ( CPSO# 82079 )

Business Address:
100 - 688 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3B7
Phone Number: (416) 462-1777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUSSELL HOOMAN JAFRUDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFRUDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006