Jagan, Gavin Sunil (CPSO#: 63956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: (416) 290-5986
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G S Jagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jagan ( CPSO# 63956 )

Business Address:
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto ON  M1P 0A3
Phone Number: (416) 290-0361

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GAVIN SUNIL JAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992