Jain, Arun Kumar (CPSO#: 30290)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Oct 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1978
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 Nov 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1984
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 31 Mar 1996
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 19 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2008 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., October 16, 2008, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Arun Kumar Jain:

                  (i)   Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College
                        in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon certified by the
                        Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and
                        acceptable to the College (the "Surgical Assist Supervisor").
                  
                  (ii)  The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the
                        College and will provide monthly reports to the College regarding
                        Dr. Jain's progress in the training program.
                  
                  (iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed
                        competent in the field of surgical assisting by the Surgical Assist
                        Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three
                        months.
                  
                  (iv)  While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be
                        the most responsible physician for any patients and will not
                        provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or
                        post-operative care.
                  
                  (v)   The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain. 
                  
                  (vi)  Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practice
                        medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the following terms:
                  
                        (a)   Dr. Jain may practice as a surgical assist in a hospital
                              based setting and when a College approved certified surgeon
                              who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of
                              Ontario is performing the surgery and in attendance;
                        (b)   Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any
                              patients and  shall not provide any continuity of care to any
                              patients including any pre- or  post-operative care.
                  
                  (vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his
                        practice by College representatives for the purpose of monitoring
                        and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order;
                  
                  (viii)Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including,
                        without limitation, those set out in the Summary of Narcotics,
                        Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and
                        Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the Compendium of
                        Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I
                        through IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C. 1996,
                        c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Mar 1999
Summary:

On March 11, 1999, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to professional misconduct as defined in 
Ontario Regulation 856/93, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession,    contrary to 
s. 1(1)(2); in that he contravened the Medicine Act, 1991, the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, or the regulations under 
either of those Acts, contrary to s. 1(1)(27); in that he contravened a federal, provincial or territorial law, a municipal by-law or a 
by-law or rule of a public hospital if (i) the purpose of the law, by-law or rule is to protect public health, or (ii) the contravention 
is relevant to his suitability to practice, contrary to s. 1(1)(28);and in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 1(1)(33).    The Committee also accepted Dr. Jain s plea of guilty to the charge 
of incompetence, as defined in s. 52(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
Professions Act, 1991, as amended, in that his professional care of a patient displayed a lack of knowledge, skill or judgment or 
disregard for the welfare of the patient of a nature or to an extent that demonstrates that he is unfit to continue to practice or 
that his practice should be restricted. 
 
The Committee ordered Dr. Jain s certificate of registration be revoked. 
 
 
On October 16, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario directed the Registrar to 
reinstate Dr. Arun Kumar Jain's certificate of registration and to impose the following terms, conditions, and limitations on Dr. 
Jain's certificate of registration: 
 
(i)   Dr. Jain will complete a training program acceptable to the College in the field of surgical assisting with a surgeon 
      certified by the Royal College of Surgeons working in a hospital setting and acceptable to the College (the "Surgical 
      Assist Supervisor"). 
 
(ii)  The Surgical Assist Supervisor will execute an Undertaking to the College and will provide monthly reports to the 
      College regarding Dr. Jain's progress in the training program. 
 
(iii) Dr. Jain will participate in the training program until deemed competent in the field of surgical assisting by the 
      Surgical Assist Supervisor, but in any event for a period of no less than three months. 
 
(iv)  While participating in the training program, Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and 
      will not provide any continuity of care to any patients including any pre or post-operative care. 
 
(v)   The costs of the training program will be borne by Dr. Jain.  
 
 
 
 
 
(vi)  Following completion of the training program, Dr. Jain may practice medicine as a surgical assistant only and on the 
      following terms: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Jain may practice as a surgical assist in a hospital based setting and when a College approved certified 
            surgeon who is a member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario is performing the surgery 
            and in attendance; 
      (b)   Dr. Jain will not be the most responsible physician for any patients and    shall not provide any continuity 
            of care to any patients including any pre- or    post-operative care. 
 
(vii) Dr. Jain will cooperate with unannounced inspections of his practice by College representatives for the purpose of 
      monitoring and enforcing compliance with the terms of this Order; 
 
(viii) Dr. Jain is prohibited from prescribing all medications, including, without limitation, those set out in the Summary of 
      Narcotics, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs and Benzodiazepines/Targeted Substances taken from the 
      Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties (Health Canada) and Schedules I through IV of the Controlled Drugs 
      and Substances Act, S.C. 1996, c.19, attached as Schedule "A" to the order.  
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Feb 10, 1999

Application for Reinstatement   Download Reinstatement Decision (PDF)
Decision Date: 16 Oct 2008
Decision: Application Accepted