Jain, Hem Chand (CPSO#: 31572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1980

Summary

Former Name: Jain, Hen Chand (used until: 14 Dec 2003 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
927 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3P4
Phone: (519) 650-0006
Fax: (519) 650-6060
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.C. Jain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Jain ( CPSO# 31572 )

Business Address:
302 - 927 King Street East
Cambridge ON  N3H 3P4
Phone Number: (519) 650-0006

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 21 May 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEM CHAND JAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2001 to 31 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 31 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1980